No. 14-1136 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 18, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-3436) |
Decision Date: | March 2, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 18 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2015) |
Apr 17 2015 | Waiver of right of respondent Connie Curts to respond filed. |
May 5 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015. |
May 11 2015 | Response Requested . (Due June 10, 2015) |
Jun 10 2015 | Brief of respondent Connie Curts in opposition filed. |
Jun 23 2015 | Reply of petitioners Nestle Purina PetCare Company, et al. filed. |
Jun 24 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Jun 29 2015 | Letter from counsel for petitioners Nestle Purina PetCare Company, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 5 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5600 |
Counsel of Record | 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: Nestle Purina PetCare Company, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Stephen J. Moore | Shank & Hamilton, P.C. | (816) 471-0909 |
Counsel of Record | 2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 1600 | |
Kansas City, MO 64108 | ||
sjm@shankhamilton.com | ||
Party name: Connie Curts |