No. 14-1008 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 20, 2015 | |||
Linked with 14A735 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Ohio |
Case Nos.: | (2011-0122) |
Decision Date: | September 3, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 22, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 6 2015 | Application (14A735) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2015 to February 19, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Jan 12 2015 | Application (14A735) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 19, 2015. |
Feb 19 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2015) |
Mar 4 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 22, 2015. |
Mar 4 2015 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner |
Mar 23 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Mar 23 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Network filed. |
Apr 22 2015 | Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. |
May 6 2015 | Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Hardin filed. |
May 12 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015. |
Jun 1 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Jeffrey L. Fisher | Stanford Law School | (650) 724-7081 |
Counsel of Record | Supreme Court Litigation Clinic | |
559 Nathan Abbott Way | ||
Stanford, CA 94305-8610 | ||
jlfisher@law.stanford.edu | ||
Party name: Jeffrey Hardin | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Eric E. Murphy | State Solicitor | (614) 466-8980 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
30 East Broad Street, 17th Fl. | ||
Columbus, OH 43215-3428 | ||
eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov | ||
Party name: Ohio | ||
Other: | ||
Robert N. Hochman | Sidley Austin LLP | (312) 853-7000 |
One South Dearborn Street | ||
Chicago, IL 60603 | ||
rhochman@sidley.com | ||
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers | ||
Lori R Mason | Cooley LLP | (415) 693-2000 |
101 California Street | ||
5th Floor | ||
San Francisco, CA 94111 | ||
lmason@cooley.com | ||
Party name: The Innocence Network |