No. 13-963 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 12, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Missouri |
Case Nos.: | (SC92615) |
Decision Date: | November 12, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 10 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 14, 2014) |
Feb 21 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 14, 2014. |
Apr 3 2014 | Brief of respondent David A. McNeal in opposition filed. |
Apr 21 2014 | Reply of petitioner Missouri filed. |
Apr 22 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2014. |
May 19 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Shaun J. Mackelprang | Division Chief, Criminal Div. | (573) 751-0272 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
P.O. Box 899 | ||
Jefferson City, MO 65102 | ||
shaun.mackelprang@ago.mo.gov | ||
Party name: Missouri | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Stuart Banner | UCLA School of Law | (310) 206-8506 |
Counsel of Record | Supreme Court Clinic | |
405 Hilgard Avenue | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90095 | ||
banner@law.ucla.edu | ||
Party name: David A. McNeal |