No. 13-886 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | January 24, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A613 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-4342) |
Decision Date: | August 26, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 24, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 13 2013 | Application (13A613) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 23, 2013 to January 22, 2014, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Dec 19 2013 | Application (13A613) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 22, 2014. |
Jan 22 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2014) |
Feb 20 2014 | Brief of respondent Ford Motor Company in opposition filed. |
Mar 11 2014 | Reply of petitioner Bayshore Ford Truck Sales, Inc., et al. filed. |
Mar 12 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 28, 2014. |
Mar 31 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Thomas C. Goldstein | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202) 362-0636 |
5225 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W., Suite 404 | ||
Washington, DC 20015 | ||
tg@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Bayshore Ford Truck Sales, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Christopher T. Handman | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5719 |
Counsel of Record | 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
chris.handman@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: Ford Motor Company |