~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 27 2013 |
Application (13A552) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 19, 2013 to January 20, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 3 2013 |
Application (13A552) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 20, 2014. |
Jan 17 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 24, 2014) |
Jan 30 2014 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner. |
Feb 19 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 26, 2014. |
Feb 24 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. |
Feb 24 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Former Department of Justice and Department of Homeland Security Officials filed. |
Mar 24 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 25, 2014. |
Apr 22 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 13, 2014. |
May 13 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 12, 2014. |
Jun 9 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 14, 2014. |
Jun 24 2014 |
Motion to dismiss the petition for writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Jun 25 2014 |
Letter of consent to motion to dismiss the petition for writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Jun 25 2014 |
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |