No. 13-8707 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 18, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (WR-57,004-03) |
Decision Date: | November 20, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 18 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 20, 2014) |
Mar 28 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 21, 2014. |
Apr 17 2014 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Apr 30 2014 | Reply of petitioner Duane Edward Buck filed. |
May 7 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 22, 2014. |
May 27 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Christina A. Swarns | NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. | (212) 965-2200 |
Counsel of Record | 40 Rector Street, Fifth Floor | |
New York, NY 10006 | ||
cswarns@naacpldf.org | ||
Party name: Duane Edward Buck | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Tomee M. Heining | Assistant Attorney General | (512) 936-1600 |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 12548 | |
Capitol Station | ||
Austin, TX 78711 | ||
Party name: Texas |