No. 13-7909 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | December 19, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-50766) |
Decision Date: | September 17, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 13 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 21, 2014) |
Jan 7 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 12, 2014. |
Feb 6 2014 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 14, 2014. |
Mar 14 2014 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Mar 24 2014 | Reply of petitioner Daniel Raul Espinoza filed. |
Apr 3 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2014. |
Apr 21 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 25, 2014. |
Apr 28 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Philip J. Lynch | Law Offices of Phil Lynch | (210) 883-4435 |
Counsel of Record | 17503 La Cantera Parkway, Suite 104-623 | |
San Antonio, TX 78257 | ||
LawOfficesofPhilLynch@satx.rr.com | ||
Party name: Daniel Raul Espinoza | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |