~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 10 2013 |
Application (13A370) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 21, 2013 to December 20, 2013, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Oct 11 2013 |
Application (13A370) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 20, 2013. |
Dec 20 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2014) |
Jan 15 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 21, 2014. |
Jan 21 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Association of American Physicians and Surgeons, Inc., et al. filed. |
Feb 3 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 24, 2014. |
Mar 14 2014 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Mar 28 2014 |
Reply of petitioner John Natale filed. |
Apr 2 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2014. |
Apr 21 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |