No. 13-689 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | December 9, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-5334) |
Decision Date: | June 13, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 30, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 5 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2014) |
Jan 22 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 21, 2014. |
Jan 23 2014 | Response Requested . (Due February 24, 2014) |
Feb 21 2014 | Brief of respondent Agfa Construction, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Feb 28 2014 | Reply of petitioner Jose E. Carrion filed. |
Mar 12 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 28, 2014. |
Mar 31 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Michael G. O'Neill | 30 Vesey Street | (212) 581-0990 |
Third Floor | ||
New York, NY 10007 | ||
darrow@oneillaw.com | ||
Party name: Jose E. Carrion | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Joseph Martin Labuda | Millman Labuda Law Group PLLC | (516)-328-8899 |
3000 Marcus Avenue | ||
Suite 3W8 | ||
Lake Success, NY 11042 | ||
joe@mmmlaborlaw.com | ||
Party name: Agfa Construction, Inc. |