No. 13-607 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 19, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-3207) |
Decision Date: | August 20, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 15 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2013) |
Dec 10 2013 | Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed. |
Dec 11 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 21, 2014. |
Jan 7 2014 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 20, 2014. |
Feb 20 2014 | Brief of respondent Katherine Archuleta, Director, Office of Personnel Management in opposition filed. |
Mar 5 2014 | Reply of petitioner Devon Haughton Northover filed. |
Mar 12 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 28, 2014. |
Mar 31 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Andres Myles Grajales | American Federation of Government Employees | 202-639-6426 |
80 F Street, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
Grajaa@afge.org | ||
Party name: Devon Haughton Northover | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Katherine Archuleta, Director, Office of Personnel Management | ||
Other: | ||
Gregory O'Duden | General Counsel | (202) 572-5500 |
National Treasury Employees Union | ||
1750 H Street, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union |