~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 27 2013 |
Record from USDC Northern District of Mississippi (Aberdeen) is electronic. |
Aug 20 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 23, 2013) |
Sep 23 2013 |
Brief amicus curiae of National Clearinghouse for the Defense of Battered Women filed. |
Sep 27 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 23, 2013. |
Oct 23 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 22, 2013. |
Nov 22 2013 |
Brief of respondent Christopher B. Epps, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Dec 12 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014. |
Dec 13 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Michelle Byrom filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 27 2013 |
Record Requested . |
Jan 24 2014 |
Record received from U.S.C.A. for the Fifth Circuit (1 box). |
Jan 27 2014 |
Record received from USDC Northern District of Mississippi (Aberdeen). The record is electronic. |
Jan 30 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 21, 2014. |
Jan 31 2014 |
Record received from USDC Northern District of Mississippi (Eastern Division) (1 box). |
Feb 24 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
Jul 29 2014 |
Record returned for U.S.C.A. for 5th Circuit. |