No. 13-478 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 16, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-56902) |
Decision Date: | February 7, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 16, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 14 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2013) |
Nov 7 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 16, 2013. |
Dec 16 2013 | Brief of respondent Earl Eugene Cannedy, Jr. in opposition filed. |
Dec 16 2013 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Earl Eugene Cannedy, Jr. |
Dec 31 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 17, 2014. |
Jan 21 2014 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Jan 21 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Daniel Rogers | Office of the State Attorney General | (619) 645-2283 |
Counsel of Record | P. O. Box 85266 | |
San Diego, CA 92186-5266 | ||
daniel.rogers@doj.ca.gov | ||
Party name: Darrel G. Adams, Warden | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Mark M. Kassabian | Buehler & Kassabian, LLP | (626) 792-0500 |
Counsel of Record | 350 West Colorado Boulevard, Suite 200 | |
Pasadena, CA 91105 | ||
mkassabian@buehlerkassabian.com | ||
Party name: Earl Eugene Cannedy, Jr. |