No. 13-318 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 11, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-3294, et al.) |
Decision Date: | April 16, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 10, 2013 |
Rule 12.4 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 9 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2013) |
Sep 9 2013 | Appendix of John Patrick O'Neill, Jr., et al. filed. |
Sep 25 2013 | Waiver of right of respondents Saudi Joint Relief Committee, Saudi Red Crescent Society to respond filed. |
Oct 4 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 12, 2013, for all respondents. |
Nov 12 2013 | Brief of respondents Saudi Binladin Group, et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 12 2013 | Brief of respondents Al Rajhi Bank, et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 25 2013 | Reply of petitioners on Personal Jurisdiction Issues filed. |
Nov 25 2013 | Reply of petitioners on Anti-Terrorism Act Issues filed. |
Nov 26 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 13, 2013. |
Dec 16 2013 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
May 27 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
Jun 9 2014 | Supplemental brief of petitioners John Patrick O'Neill, Jr., et al. filed. |
Jun 10 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2014. |
Jun 30 2014 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Carter G. Phillips | Sidley Austin LLP | (202) 736-8270 |
1501 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
cphillips@sidley.com | ||
Party name: John Patrick O'Neill, Jr., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Christopher M. Curran | White & Case LLP | (202) 626-3600 |
Counsel of Record | 701 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
ccurran@whitecase.com | ||
Party name: Al Rajhi Bank, et al. | ||
James Ernest Gauch | Jones Day | (202) 879-3939 |
Counsel of Record | 51 Louisiana Ave., N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
jegauch@jonesday.com | ||
Party name: Saudi Binladin Group, et al. | ||
Michael K. Kellogg | Kellogg Huber Hansen Todd Evans & Figel PLLC | (202) 326-7900 |
Counsel of Record | 1615 M Street, N.W. | |
Suite 400 | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
mkellogg@khhte.com | ||
Party name: Saudi Joint Relief Committee, Saudi Red Crescent Society | ||
Other: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |