No. 13-29 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 5, 2013 | |||
Linked with 12A1106 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-1728) |
Decision Date: | March 4, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 16 2013 | Application (12A1106) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 2, 2013 to July 3, 2013, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
May 20 2013 | Application (12A1106) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 3, 2013. |
Jul 3 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 5, 2013) |
Aug 2 2013 | Brief of respondents Ronald Byrd, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 9 2013 | Reply of petitioner Scott Andochick filed. |
Aug 14 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
George O. Peterson | Peterson Saylor PLC | (703) 225-3620 |
Counsel of Record | 10555 Main Street | |
Suite 320 | ||
Fairfax, VA 22030 | ||
gpeterson@petersonsaylor.com | ||
Party name: Scott Andochick | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Hal Witt | Furey Doolan & Abell LLP | (301) 652-6880 |
Counsel of Record | 8401 Connecticut Avenue LLP | |
Chevy Chase, MD 20815-5819 | ||
jspencer@fdalaw.com | ||
Party name: Ronald Byrd, et al. |