No. 13-180 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 8, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-10209, 11-10242) |
Decision Date: | March 4, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 7, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 5 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 9, 2013) |
Aug 15 2013 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner. |
Sep 4 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Scientists and Academics filed. |
Sep 5 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 9, 2013. |
Sep 9 2013 | Brief amicus curiae of Abilgail Alliance for Better Access to Developmental Drugs filed. |
Sep 9 2013 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. |
Sep 9 2013 | Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. |
Sep 25 2013 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 8, 2013. |
Nov 8 2013 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Nov 25 2013 | Reply of petitioner W. Scott Harkonen filed. |
Nov 26 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 13, 2013. |
Dec 16 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Carter G. Phillips | Sidley Austin LLP | (202) 736-8270 |
1501 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
cphillips@sidley.com | ||
Party name: W. Scott Harkonen | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States | ||
Other: | ||
Lisa S. Blatt | Arnold & Porter LLP | (202) 942-5000 |
555 12th Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
Lisa.Blatt@aporter.com | ||
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of america | ||
Becky Walker James | 17383 Sunset Boulevard, Suite A315 | (310)-492-5104 |
Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 | ||
becky@walkerjameslaw.com | ||
Party name: Scientists and Academics | ||
Daniel Meron | Latham & Watkins LLP | (202) 637-2218 |
555 11th Street, NW, Ste. 1000 | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
daniel.meron@lw.com | ||
Party name: Abilgail Alliance for Better Access to Developmental Drugs | ||
Mark A. Perry | Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
mperry@gibsondunn.com | ||
Party name: Law Professors |