~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 24 2013 |
Application (12A1132) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2013 to August 5, 2013, submitted to Justice Breyer. |
May 24 2013 |
Application (12A1132) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until August 5, 2013. |
Aug 5 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 6, 2013) |
Aug 28 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 7, 2013. |
Oct 1 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2013. |
Nov 4 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2013. |
Dec 2 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 6, 2014. |
Jan 6 2014 |
Brief of respondent Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General in opposition filed. |
Jan 22 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 21, 2014. |
Jan 22 2014 |
Reply of petitioners Erasmo Rojas-Perez, et ux. filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 14 2014 |
Letter of February 12, 2014, from counsel for respondent received. (Distributed) |
Feb 18 2014 |
Letter of February 18, 2014, from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed) |
Feb 24 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |