No. 13-16 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 2, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-2150) |
Decision Date: | March 1, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 29, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 27 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2013) |
Jul 30 2013 | Brief of respondent The Hanover Insurance Company in opposition filed. |
Aug 13 2013 | Reply of petitioner Stanley Marvin Campbell filed. TBP |
Aug 14 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
A. Burton Shuford | The Bain Group, PLLC | (980) 321-7000 |
1909 J.N. Pease Place, Suite 101 | ||
Charlotte, NC 28262 | ||
bshuford@thebaingroup.net | ||
Party name: Stanley Marvin Campbell | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
William L. Esser IV. | Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP | 704-335-9507 |
Counsel of Record | 401 S. Tryon Street,. Suite 3000 | |
Charlotte, NC 28202 | ||
willesser@parkerpoe.com | ||
Party name: The Hanover Insurance Company |