No. 13-1409 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 27, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A926 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Maryland |
Case Nos.: | (26, September Term, 2013) |
Decision Date: | December 23, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 12 2014 | Application (13A926) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 23, 2014 to May 22, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Mar 12 2014 | Application (13A926) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 22, 2014. |
May 22 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 26, 2014) |
May 29 2014 | Waiver of right of respondent Maryland to respond filed. |
Jun 10 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2014. |
Oct 1 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014. |
Oct 20 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Juan Pablo Reyes | Office of the Public Defender | (410)-767-4284 |
6 Saint Paul Street | ||
Suite 1302 | ||
Baltimore, MD 21202 | ||
jreyes@opd.state.md.us | ||
Party name: Wesley Torrance Kelly | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Brian S. Kleinbord | Assistant Attorney General | (410) 576-6435 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
200 St. Paul Place, 17th Floor | ||
Baltimore, MD 21202 | ||
bkleinbord@oag.state.md.us | ||
Party name: Maryland |