No. 13-1345 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 7, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A652 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-15442) |
Decision Date: | August 8, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 3, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 19 2013 | Application (13A652) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2014 to March 2, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 30 2013 | Application (13A652) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 2, 2014. |
Mar 3 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2014) |
Jun 2 2014 | Brief of respondent Carl Humphrey, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jun 6 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Public Counsel, Loyola Law School Project for the Innocent, and Death Penalty Focus filed. |
Jun 17 2014 | Reply of petitioner Joshua Daniel Bishop filed. |
Jun 18 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Sarah Gerwig-Moore | Mercer University School of Law | (478)-301-2195 |
Counsel of Record | 1021 Georgia Avenue | |
Macon, GA 31207 | ||
Party name: Joshua Daniel Bishop | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Sabrina D. Graham | Senior Assistant Attorney General | (404) 656-7659 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
40 Capitol Square | ||
Atlanta, GA 30334-1300 | ||
sgraham@law.ga.gov | ||
Party name: Carl Humphrey, Warden | ||
Other: | ||
Paula M. Mitchell | 355 South Grand Avenue | (213) 457-8000 |
Suite 2900 | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90012 | ||
paula_Mitchell@ca9.uscourts.gov | ||
Party name: Public Counsel, Loyola Law School Project for the Innocent, and Death Penalty Focus |