No. 13-1343 | ||||
Vide 13-1284 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 8, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-60938) |
Decision Date: | December 23, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 29, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 29 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 9, 2014) |
Jun 9 2014 | Brief of respondent Mississippi Department of Health in opposition filed. |
Jun 24 2014 | Reply of petitioner Albert Brown filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 25 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Robert Nicholas Norris | Watson & Norris, PLLC | (601) 968-0000 |
Counsel of Record | 628 N. State Street | |
Jackson, MS 39202 | ||
nick@watsonnorris.com | ||
Party name: Albert Brown | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Armin J. Moeller Jr. | Balch & Bingham LLP | (601) 961-9900 |
Counsel of Record | 188 East Capitol Street | |
Suite 1400 | ||
Jackson, MS 39201 | ||
amoeller@balch.com | ||
Party name: Mississippi Department of Health |