No. 13-1342 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 7, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2013-7014) |
Decision Date: | August 15, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 5 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 6, 2014) |
May 30 2014 | Waiver of right of respondent Sloan D. Gibson, Acting Secretary of Veterans Affairs to respond filed. |
Jun 3 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 19, 2014. |
Jun 4 2014 | Brief amici curiae of The American Legion, and Vietnam Veterans of America filed. |
Jun 12 2014 | Response Requested . (Due July 14, 2014) |
Jul 10 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 13, 2014. |
Aug 13 2014 | Brief of respondent Robert A. McDonald, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed. |
Aug 27 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Ranganath Tangali Sudarshan | Covington & Burling LLP | (202) 662-6000 |
1201 Pennsylvania Ave NW | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
rsudarshan@cov.com | ||
Party name: Birdeye L. Middleton | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Robert A. McDonald, Secretary of Veterans Affairs | ||
Other: | ||
Paul J. Zidlicky | Sidley & Austin LLP | (202) 736-8013 |
1501 K Street, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
pzidlicky@sidley.com | ||
Party name: The American Legion, and Vietnam Veterans of America |