No. 13-1301 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | April 28, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A863 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-2131) |
Decision Date: | December 10, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 21 2014 | Application (13A863) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 10, 2014 to April 24, 2014, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Feb 25 2014 | Application (13A863) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until April 24, 2014. |
Apr 24 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2014) |
May 20 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 27, 2014. |
May 27 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Children's Advocacy Institute, et al. filed. |
May 27 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. filed. |
May 28 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. |
Jun 27 2014 | Brief of respondent Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General in opposition filed. |
Jul 16 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Jul 16 2014 | Reply of petitioner Clerde Pierre filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 6 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Michael J. Wishnie | Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization | (203) 432-1426 |
127 Wall Street | ||
New Haven, CT 06511 | ||
Party name: Clerde Pierre | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Michael Robert Lazerwitz | Cleary Gottleib Steen & Hamilton LLP | (212) 225-2000 |
One Liberty Plaza | ||
New York, NY 10006 | ||
mlazerwitz@cgsh.com | ||
Party name: Children's Advocacy Institute, et al. | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General | ||
Other: | ||
Sanket J. Bulsara | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (212) 230-8800 |
7 World Trade Center | ||
New York, NY 10007 | ||
sanket.bulsara@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Law Professors | ||
Moses Silverman | Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP | (212) 373-3000 |
1285 Avenue of the Americas | ||
New York, NY 10019 | ||
msilverman@paulweiss.com | ||
Party name: Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al. |