No. 13-1251 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | April 17, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1498, 2012-1499) |
Decision Date: | September 12, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 16, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 16 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2014) |
May 15 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 18, 2014, for all respondents. |
Jun 18 2014 | Brief of respondent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Jul 2 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
James B. Monroe | Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, L. L. P. | (202) 408-4000 |
901 New York Avenue, NW | ||
Washington, DC, DC 20001-4413 | ||
Party name: Pronova BioPharma Norge AS | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
William M. Jay | Goodwin Procter LLP | (202) 346-4000 |
Counsel of Record | 901 New York Avenue, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
wjay@goodwinprocter.com | ||
Party name: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al. | ||
Daniel G. Brown | Latham & Watkins LLP | (212) 906-1200 |
53rd at Third | ||
885 Third Avenue | ||
New York, NY 10022-4834 | ||
daniel.brown@lw.com | ||
Party name: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al. |