~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 8 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2014) |
Apr 16 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Suzanne R. Hastings, Warden, et al. to respond filed. |
Apr 22 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2014. |
Apr 30 2014 |
Response Requested . (Due May 30, 2014) |
May 20 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 30, 2014. |
Jun 17 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 30, 2014. |
Jul 30 2014 |
Brief of respondents Suzanne R. Hastings, Warden. in opposition filed. |
Aug 4 2014 |
Letter of August 4, 2014, from the Solicitor General received. |
Aug 13 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Aug 13 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Albert Williams filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |