No. 13-1181 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 31, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-17483) |
Decision Date: | September 10, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 27, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 27 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 30, 2014) |
Apr 22 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 27, 2014. |
Apr 30 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of Information Technology & Innovation Foundation filed. |
May 27 2014 | Brief of respondents Benjamin Joffe, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 9 2014 | Reply of petitioner Google, Inc. filed. |
Jun 10 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2014. |
Jun 30 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Seth P. Waxman | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (202) 663-6000 |
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Google, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Elizabeth J. Cabraser | Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP | (415) 956-1000 |
Counsel of Record | 275 Battery Street, 29th Floor | |
San Francisco, CA 94111-3339 | ||
ecabraser@lchb.com | ||
Party name: Benjamin Joffe, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
Michael S. Kwun | Keker & Van Nest LLP | (415) 391-5400 |
633 Battery Street | ||
San Francisco, CA 94111-1809 | ||
Mkwun@kvn.com | ||
Party name: Information Technology & Innovation Foundation |