No. 13-1178 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 28, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A608 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-3333) |
Decision Date: | August 8, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 22, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 11 2013 | Application (13A608) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2014 to March 21, 2014, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Dec 13 2013 | Application (13A608) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until March 21, 2014. |
Mar 21 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 28, 2014) |
Apr 24 2014 | Waiver of right of respondents Marvel Characters, Incorporated, et al. to respond filed. |
Apr 29 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2014. |
May 14 2014 | Response Requested . (Due June 13, 2014) |
May 28 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 14, 2014. |
Jun 13 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Bruce Lehman, et al. filed. |
Jun 13 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of The California Society of Entertainment Lawyers filed. |
Jun 13 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Mark Evanier, John Morrow, and Pen Center USA filed. |
Jun 13 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, et al. filed. |
Jul 14 2014 | Brief of respondents Marvel Characters, Incorporated, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jul 29 2014 | Reply of petitioners Lisa R. Kirby, et al. filed. |
Jul 30 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Sep 26 2014 | Stipulation to dismiss the petition for writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Sep 26 2014 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Thomas C. Goldstein | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202) 362-0636 |
Counsel of Record | 7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850 | |
Bethesda, MD 20814 | ||
tg@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Lisa R. Kirby, et al. | ||
Marc Toberoff | Toberoff & Associates, P.C. | (310) 246-3333 |
22337 Pacific Coast Hwy | ||
#348 | ||
Malibu, CA 90265 | ||
mtoberoff@ipwla.com | ||
Party name: Lisa R. Kirby, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
R. Bruce Rich | Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP | (212) 310-8000 |
Counsel of Record | 767 Fifth Avenue | |
New York, NY 10153 | ||
bruce.rich@weil.com | ||
Party name: Marvel Characters, Incorporated, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
Duncan Crabtree-Ireland | SAG-AFTRA | (323) 549-6627 |
5757 Wilshire Blvd., 7th Floor | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90036 | ||
dci@sagaftra.org | ||
Party name: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television Artists, et al. | ||
Bruce Arthur Lehman | 1900 K Street NW | 202-544-6610 |
Suite 725 | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
blehman@iipi.org | ||
Party name: Bruce Lehman, et al. | ||
Steven T. Lowe | Lowe & Associates | 310-477-5811 |
11400 Olympic Blvd. | ||
Suite*640 | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90064 | ||
steven@lowelaw.com | ||
Party name: The California Society of Entertainment Lawyers | ||
Steven William Smyrski | Smyrski Law Group APC | (310) 397-9118 |
3310 Airport Ave., SW | ||
Santa Monica, CA 90405 | ||
steve@smyrski.com | ||
Party name: Mark Evanier, John Morrow, and Pen Center USA |