No. 13-1165 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 25, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1415) |
Decision Date: | October 2, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 26, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 21 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2014) |
Apr 24 2014 | Brief of respondent TecSec, Inc. in opposition filed. |
May 13 2014 | Reply of petitioners Cisco Systems, Inc., et al. filed. |
May 13 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2014. |
Jun 2 2014 | Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Michael W. McConnell | Kirkland & Ellis LLP | (202) 879-5000 |
Counsel of Record | 655 Fifteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
michael.mcconnell@kirkland.com | ||
Party name: Cisco Systems, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Gregory Neil Stillman | Hunton & Williams LLP | (757) 640-5314 |
Counsel of Record | 500 East Main St., Suite 1000 | |
Norfolk, VA 23510 | ||
gstillman@hunton.com | ||
Party name: TecSec, Inc. |