No. 13-1073 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 7, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-99016) |
Decision Date: | October 25, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 5 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2014) |
Mar 19 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2014. |
Apr 24 2014 | Brief of respondent Steven Craig James in opposition filed. |
May 9 2014 | Reply of petitioner Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections filed. (Distributed) |
May 12 2014 | Motion for leave to proceed further in forma pauperis filed by respondent Steven Craig James. |
May 13 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2014. |
Jun 2 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Lacey Stover Gard | Assistant Attorney General | (520) 628-6520 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
400 West Congress Street, S-315 | ||
Tucson, AZ 85701 | ||
Lacey.Gard@azag.gov | ||
Party name: Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Gary T. Lowenthal | 1490 Camino Corrales | (505) 982-6708 |
Counsel of Record | Santa Fe, NM 87505 | |
gary.lowenthal@asu.edu | ||
Party name: Steven Craig James |