No. 13-1056 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 5, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-16018, 12-17198) |
Decision Date: | October 4, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 3, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 3 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 4, 2014) |
Mar 18 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 2, 2014. |
May 2 2014 | Brief of respondents John Armstrong, et al. in opposition filed. |
May 19 2014 | Reply of petitioners Edmund G. Brown, Jr., et al. filed. |
May 20 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 5, 2014. |
Jun 9 2014 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Thomas S. Patterson | Deputy Attorney General | (415) 703-5727 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
455 Golden Gate Avenue | ||
Suite 11000 | ||
San Francisco, CA 94102-7004 | ||
thomas.patterson@doj.ca.gov | ||
Party name: Edmund G. Brown, Jr., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Michael W. Bien | Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld, LLP | (415) 433-6830 |
Counsel of Record | 315 Montgomery Street, 10th Flr | |
San Francisco, CA 94104 | ||
ggrunfeld@rbgg.com | ||
Party name: John Armstrong, et al. | ||