No. 13-103 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 25, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-5334) |
Decision Date: | January 15, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 24, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 23 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2013) |
Aug 26 2013 | Brief of respondent William G. Moore, Jr. in opposition filed. |
Sep 11 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Sep 11 2013 | Reply of petitioners Michael Hartman, et al. filed. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice and Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Jeffrey A. Lamken | MoloLamken LLP | (202) 556-2000 |
The Watergate, Suite 660 | ||
600 New Hampshire Ave., NW | ||
Washington, DC 20037 | ||
jlamken@mololamken.com | ||
Party name: Michael Hartman, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Paul Michael Pohl | Jones Day | (412) 391-3939 |
Counsel of Record | 500 Grant Street | |
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 | ||
pmpohl@jonesday.com | ||
Party name: William G. Moore, Jr. |