~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 20 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 20, 2014) |
May 20 2014 |
Application (13A1153) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito. |
May 20 2014 |
Brief of respondent George A. Lombardi, Director, Missouri Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
May 21 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Russell Bucklew filed. |
May 21 2014 |
Application (13A1153) referred to the Court. |
May 21 2014 |
The application (13A1153) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is treated as an application for stay pending appeal in the Eighth Circuit. The application is granted pending the disposition of petitioner’s appeal. We leave for further consideration in the lower courts whether an evidentiary hearing is necessary. |
May 30 2014 |
Motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
Jun 16 2014 |
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |