No. 13-1014 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 25, 2014 | |||
Linked with 13A742 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1362, -1382, -1383, -1454) |
Decision Date: | May 16, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 25, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 13 2014 | Application (13A742) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2014 to February 21, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jan 15 2014 | Application (13A742) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 21, 2014. |
Feb 21 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2014) |
Feb 21 2014 | Appendix of NSK Corporation, et al. filed. |
Mar 5 2014 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners. |
Mar 7 2014 | Waiver of right of respondents SKF Aeroengine Bearings UK and SKF USA Inc. to respond filed. |
Mar 10 2014 | Waiver of right of respondents FAG Italia SpA, et al. to respond filed. |
Mar 19 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 28, 2014, for all respondents. |
Mar 26 2014 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither psrty, received from counsel for respondents, FAG Italia Spa, Schaeffler Group USA, Inc., Schaeffler KG, The Barden Corp.(UK.) Ltd., and the Barden Corporation |
Mar 27 2014 | Brief amici curiae of 7 International Trade Law Professors filed. |
Mar 27 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of Japan Bearing Industry Association filed. |
Apr 28 2014 | Brief of respondent The Timken Company in opposition filed. |
Apr 28 2014 | Brief of the Federal Respondent in opposition filed. |
May 12 2014 | Reply of petitioners NSK Corporation, et al. filed. |
May 13 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2014. |
Jun 2 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Carter G. Phillips | Sidley Austin LLP | (202) 736-8270 |
1501 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
cphillips@sidley.com | ||
Party name: NSK Corporation, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Max F. Schutzman | Grumfeld, Desiderio, Lebowitz, Silverman & Klestadt | (202) 783-6881 |
Counsel of Record | 1201 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 650 | |
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
Party name: FAG Italia SpA, et al. | ||
Herbert C. Shelley | Steptoe & Johnson LLP | (202) 429-8146 |
Counsel of Record | 1330 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
Party name: SKF Aeroengine Bearings UK and SKF USA Inc. | ||
Terence P. Stewart | Stewart and Stewart | (202) 785-4185 |
Counsel of Record | 2100 M Street, NW, Suite 200 | |
Washington, DC 20037 | ||
tstewart@stewartlaw.com | ||
Party name: The Timken Company | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: International Trade Commission, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
William G. Dittrick | Baird Holm LLP | (402) 636-8205 |
1700 Farnam Street | ||
Suite 1500 | ||
Omaha, NE 68102 | ||
wdittrick@bairdholm.com | ||
Party name: 7 International Trade Law Professors | ||
Michael A. Pollard | Baker & McKenzie LLP | (312) 861-2786 |
130 East Randolph Drive | ||
Suite 3500 | ||
Chicago, IL 60601 | ||
michael.pollard@bakermckenzie.com | ||
Party name: Japan Bearing Industry Association |