No. 12-8910 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 26, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-56233) |
Decision Date: | August 27, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 22 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 28, 2013) |
Mar 4 2013 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Mar 7 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 22, 2013. |
Mar 25 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Kenneth H. Hodgell | 87643-198 | |
3705 W. Farm Road | ||
Lompoc, CA 93436 | ||
Party name: Kenneth Hodgell | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |