~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 7 2012 |
Application (12A588) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 23, 2012 to February 21, 2013, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Dec 11 2012 |
Application (12A588) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 21, 2013. |
Feb 21 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 27, 2013) |
Mar 22 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 26, 2013. |
Apr 23 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 28, 2013. |
May 28 2013 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Jun 13 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Sep 6 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Lynne F. Stewart filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 7 2013 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |