No. 12-7544 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | December 3, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-4963, 11-4965) |
Decision Date: | October 23, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 28 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2013) |
Dec 7 2012 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Dec 13 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2013. |
Jan 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Parks N. Small | Federal Public Defender | (803) 765-5070 |
1901 Assembly Street | ||
Suite 200 | ||
Columbia, SC 29201 | ||
Party name: Robert Peoples | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |