No. 12-6652 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 10, 2012 | |||
Linked with 12A346 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (AP-76,374, AP-76,376, & AP-76-381) |
Decision Date: | June 27, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 22, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 10 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 9, 2012) |
Oct 10 2012 | Application (12A346) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Oct 10 2012 | Application (12A346) denied by Justice Scalia. |
Oct 10 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
Oct 10 2012 | Application (12A346) refiled and submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Oct 10 2012 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Oct 10 2012 | Application (12A346) referred to the Court. |
Oct 10 2012 | Application (12A346) denied by the Court. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Philip Harlan Hilder | Hilder & Associates, P.C. | (713) 655-9111 |
819 Lovett Boulevard | ||
Houston, TX 77006-3905 | ||
Party name: Jonathan Marcus Green | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Tomee M. Heining | Assistant Attorney General | (512) 936-1600 |
P.O. Box 12548 | ||
Capitol Station | ||
Austin, TX 78711 | ||
Party name: Texas |