No. 12-6373 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 24, 2012 | |||
Linked with 12A283 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-70026) |
Decision Date: | September 21, 2012 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 13, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 23 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 24, 2012) |
Sep 23 2012 | Application (12A283) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Sep 24 2012 | Brief of respondent Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Sep 24 2012 | Reply of petitioner Cleve Foster filed. |
Sep 25 2012 | Application (12A283) referred to the Court. |
Sep 25 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
Sep 25 2012 | Application (12A283) denied by the Court. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would grant the application for stay of execution. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Maurie Levin | 211 South Street, #346 | (512) 294-1540 |
Philadelphia, PA 19147 | ||
maurielevin@gmail.com | ||
Party name: Cleve Foster | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Stephen M. Hoffman | Assistant Attorney General | (512) 936-1400 |
Postconviction Litigation Division | ||
Post Office Box 12548 | ||
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
Party name: Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |