No. 12-563 | ||||
Vide 12-712 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 7, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-2354) |
Decision Date: | August 20, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 6 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2012) |
Dec 7 2012 | Brief of respondent City of Frankenmuth, Michigan in opposition filed. |
Dec 12 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2013. |
Dec 14 2012 | Reply of petitioners Ronald Loesel, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5528 |
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: Ronald Loesel, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Mary Massaron Ross | President of DRI | (312) 795-1101 |
Counsel of Record | DRI- The Voice of the Defense Bar | |
55 West Monroe | ||
Suite 2000 | ||
Chicago, IL 6063 | ||
mmassaron@plunkettcooney.com | ||
Party name: City of Frankenmuth, Michigan |