No. 12-457 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 12, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-15595) |
Decision Date: | June 4, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 12, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 10 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2012) |
Nov 1 2012 | Waiver of right of respondent Jeanene Harlick to respond filed. |
Nov 13 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 30, 2012. |
Nov 13 2012 | Brief amicus curiae of Blue Cross Blue Shield Association filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 13 2012 | Brief amici curiae of Association of California Life and Health Insurance Companies, et al. |
Nov 27 2012 | Response Requested . (Due December 27, 2012) |
Dec 12 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 28, 2013. |
Jan 28 2013 | Brief of respondent Jeanene Harlick in opposition filed. |
Feb 5 2013 | Reply of petitioner California Physicians' Service, dba Blue Shield of California filed. |
Feb 13 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 1, 2013. |
Mar 4 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Michael M. Berger | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP | (310) 312-4000 |
11355 West Olympic Boulevard | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90064-1614 | ||
mmberger@manatt.com | ||
Party name: California Physicians' Service, dba Blue Shield of California | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Lisa S. Kantor | Kantor & Kantor, LLP | (818) 886-2525 |
Counsel of Record | 19839 Nordhoff Street | |
Northridge, CA 91324 | ||
lkantor@kantorlaw.net | ||
Party name: Jeanene Harlick | ||
Other: | ||
John M. LeBlanc | Barger & Wolen LLP | (213)-680-2800 |
633 West Fifth Street | ||
47th Floor | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90071 | ||
jleblanc@bargerwolen.com | ||
Party name: Association of California Life and Health Insurance Companies, et al. | ||
Anthony F. Shelley | Miller & Chevalier Chartered | (202) 626-5800 |
655 15th Street, N.W. | ||
Suite 900 | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
ashelley@milchev.com | ||
Party name: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association |