No. 12-407 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 3, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Missouri, Eastern District |
Case Nos.: | (ED96999) |
Decision Date: | March 27, 2012 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | July 3, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 1 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2012) |
Oct 19 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 3, 2012. |
Nov 27 2012 | Brief of respondent Kyle J. Kelly in opposition filed. |
Dec 7 2012 | Reply of petitioner Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC filed. |
Dec 12 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2013. |
Jan 7 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 11, 2013. |
Jan 14 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Garry George Mathiason | Littler Mendelson | (415) 433-1940 |
Counsel of Record | 650 California St. | |
20th Floor | ||
San Francisco, CA 94108 | ||
GMathiason@littler.com | ||
Party name: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Ray A. Gerritzen | Geritzen & Gerritzen | (314) 231-2786 |
Counsel of Record | One U.S. Bank Plaza, Suite 2205 | |
505 N. 7th Street | ||
St. Louis, MO 63101-1600 | ||
Party name: Kyle J. Kelly |