No. 12-351 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 21, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | Fifth Judicial District Court of Louisiana, Franklin Parish |
Case Nos.: | (C-40232) |
Decision Date: | December 12, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | June 22, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 20 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2012) |
Oct 22 2012 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Bankers Association, et al. |
Oct 22 2012 | Brief of respondent Joe Doughty in opposition filed. |
Oct 31 2012 | Reply of petitioners George W. Cummings, III, et al. filed. |
Nov 5 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012. |
Nov 26 2012 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by American Bankers Association, et al. GRANTED. |
Nov 26 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Thomas M. Hefferon | Goodwin Procter LLP | (202) 346-4000 |
901 New York Avenue, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
thefferon@goodwinprocter.com | ||
Party name: George W. Cummings, III, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Bobby L. Culpepper | 525 East Court Avenue | (318) 388-4440 |
Counsel of Record | Jonesboro, LA 71251-3437 | |
Party name: Joe Doughty | ||
Other: | ||
Thomas James Pinder | 1120 Connecticut Avenue, NW | (202)-663-5028 |
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
tpinder@aba.com | ||
Party name: American Bankers Association, et al. |