No. 12-339 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 19, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2011-1558) |
Decision Date: | April 13, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 26, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 17 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2012) |
Oct 18 2012 | Brief of respondents Aeropostale, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 24 2012 | Reply of petitioners Picture Patents LLC, et al. filed. |
Oct 29 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012. |
Nov 26 2012 | Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Constantine John Gekas | Gekas Law LLP | (312) 726-4501 |
Suite 1700 | ||
Eleven South LaSalle Street | ||
Chicago, IL 60603 | ||
CJG@gekaslaw.com | ||
Party name: Picture Patents LLC, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Mark J. Abate | Goodwin Proctor LLP | (212)-813-8800 |
Counsel of Record | 620 Eighth Avenue | |
New York, NY 10018 | ||
Party name: Aeropostale, Inc., et al. |