No. 12-308 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 12, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-12392-P) |
Decision Date: | April 27, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 21, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 10 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2012) |
Oct 12 2012 | Brief of respondent Vernon Madison in opposition filed. |
Oct 12 2012 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Vernon Madison. |
Oct 22 2012 | Reply of petitioners Kim T. Thomas, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 24 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 9, 2012. |
Nov 13 2012 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Nov 13 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
John C. Neiman Jr. | Solicitor General | (334) 242-7300 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Alabama Attorney General | |
501 Washington Avenue | ||
Montgomery, AL 36104 | ||
jneiman@ago.state.al.us | ||
Party name: Kim T. Thomas, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Angela L. Setzer | Equal Justice Initiative of Alabama | (334) 269-1803 |
Counsel of Record | 122 Commerce Street | |
Montgomery, AL 36104 | ||
asetzer@eji.org | ||
Party name: Vernon Madison |