No. 12-239 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 23, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Minnesota |
Case Nos.: | (A10-74) |
Decision Date: | April 25, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 23, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 21 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 24, 2012) |
Sep 21 2012 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 24, 2012. |
Oct 24 2012 | Brief of respondent Michael William Sahr in opposition filed. |
Oct 24 2012 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent. |
Nov 5 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012. |
Feb 20 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 22, 2013. |
Feb 25 2013 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Feb 25 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Thomas J. Harbinson | Stearns County Attoney's Office | (320) 656-3854 |
Admin. Ctr., Rm. 448 | ||
705 Courthouse Sq. | ||
St. Cloud, MN 56303 | ||
tom.harbinson@co.stearns.mn.us | ||
Party name: Minnesota | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Mark D. Nyvold | Special Asst. Minn. State Public Defender | (763) 276-9173 |
Counsel of Record | 7671 Central Avenue NE | |
Suite 207 | ||
Fridley, MN 55432 | ||
mark@marknyvoldlaw.com | ||
Party name: Michael William Sahr |