No. 12-207
Title:
Maryland, Petitioner
v.
Alonzo Jay King, Jr.
Docketed:August 16, 2012
Linked with 12A48
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
  Case Nos.:(68, September Term, 2011)
  Decision Date:April 24, 2012
  Rehearing Denied:May 18, 2012
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 13 2012 Application (12A48) for a stay of the judgment and mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 18 2012 UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the judgment and mandate of the Court of Appeals of Maryland, case No. 68, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Wednesday, July 25, 2012, by 4 p.m., and further order of the undersigned or of the Court.
Jul 20 2012 Response to application from respondent Alonzo Jay King, Jr. filed.
Jul 23 2012 Reply of applicant Maryland filed.
Jul 26 2012 Letter submitted by respondent
Jul 30 2012 Application (12A48) granted by The Chief Justice. (In Chambers Opinion)
Aug 14 2012 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 17, 2012)
Sep 4 2012 Brief amici curiae of Maryland Chiefs of Police Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Sep 11 2012 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 17, 2012.
Sep 12 2012 Brief amicus curiae of Steve Cooley, District Attorney for the County of Los Angeles filed.
Sep 17 2012 Brief amicus curiae of DNA Saves filed.
Sep 17 2012 Brief amici curiae of Maryland Legislators filed.
Sep 17 2012 Brief amicus curiae of National District Attorneys Association filed.
Oct 12 2012 Brief of respondent Alonzo Jay King, Jr. in opposition filed.
Oct 24 2012 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 9, 2012.
Oct 24 2012 Reply of petitioner Maryland filed. (Distributed)
Nov 9 2012 Petition GRANTED.
Nov 21 2012 Record Received from the Maryland Court of Appeals. 2 volumes.
Nov 27 2012 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the respondent.
Dec 4 2012 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Dec 18 2012 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 26, 2013
Dec 26 2012 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Dec 26 2012 Brief of petitioner Maryland filed.
Dec 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of Genetics, Genomics and Forensic Science Researchers in support of neither party filed.
Dec 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of National District Attorneys Association filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of National Governors Association, et al. filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Los Angeles County District Attorney on behalf of Los Angeles County filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Global Alliance for Rapid DNA Testing filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amici curiae of DNA Saves, et al. filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amici curiae of Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Susana Martinez, Governor of the State of New Mexico filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault filed.
Jan 2 2013 Brief amici curiae of Maryland Chiefs of Police Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 9 2013 Additional record received from the Court of Appeals of Maryland. Part of this record is electronic.
Jan 10 2013 CIRCULATED.
Jan 25 2013 Brief of respondent Alonzo Jay King, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 29 2013 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Feb 1 2013 brief amicus curiae of Veterans for Common Sense filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center and twenty-six technical experts and legal scholars filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Public Defenders Service for the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amici curiae of Genetic Scientists Robert Nussbaum and Sara H. Katsanis filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Council for Responsible Genetics filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Feb 1 2013 Brief amici curiae of 14 Scholars of Forensic Evidence filed. (Distributed)
Feb 15 2013 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 19 2013 Reply of petitioner Maryland filed. (Distributed)
Feb 26 2013 Argued. For petitioner: Katherine Winfree, Chief Deputy Attorney General, Baltimore, Md.; and Michael R. Dreeben, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C.
Jun 3 2013 Judgment REVERSED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Breyer, and Alito, JJ., joined. Scalia, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined.
Jul 5 2013 MANDATE ISSUED.
Jul 5 2013 Record returned to Court of Appeals of Maryland.
Jul 5 2013 Record returned to Circuit Court fo Wicomico County.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Brian S. Kleinbord Assistant Attorney General(410) 576-6435
    Counsel of Record 200 St. Paul Place, 17th Floor
Baltimore, MD  21202
bkleinbord@oag.state.md.us
Party name: Maryland
 
Katherine Winfree Chief Deputy Attorney General(410) 576-6300
200 Saint Paul Place
Baltimore, MD  21202
kwinfree@oag.state.md.us
Party name: Maryland
Attorneys for Respondent:
Kannon K. Shanmugam Williams & Connolly LLP(202) 434-5000
    Counsel of Record725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
kshanmugam@wc.com
Party name: Alonzo Jay King, Jr.
 
Stephen B. Mercer Chief Attorney, Forensics Division(410) 767-5541
Office of the Public Defender
6 Saint Paul St.
Suite 1400
Baltimore, MD  21202
smercer@opd.state.md.us
Party name: Alonzo Jay King, Jr.
Other:
Lisa S. Blatt Arnold & Porter LLP(202) 942-5000
555 12th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
Lisa.Blatt@aporter.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
 
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz King & Spalding LLP(202) 737-0500
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006
jbucholtz@kslaw.com
Party name: Susana Martinez, Governor of the State of New Mexico
 
Enid A. Camps 455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000(415)-703-5976
San Francisco, CA  94102
Enid.Camps@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California, et al.
 
Michael R. Dreeben Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2201
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
michael.r.dreeben@usdoj.gov
Party name: Maryland v. Alonzo Jay King, Jr.
 
Michael L. Foreman Pennsylvania State University, Civil Rights Appellate Clinic(814) 865-3832
329 Innovation Park, Suite 118
University Park, PA  16802
mlf25@psu.edu
Party name: Genetics, Genomics and Forensic Science Researchers in support of neither party
 
Aderson B. Francois Associate Professor of Law(202) 806-8065
Supervising Attorney Civil Rights Clinic
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness Street NW
Washington, DC  20008
Afrancois@law.howard.edu
Party name: Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic
 
Jonathan S. Franklin Fulbright & Jaworski L.L.P.(202) 662-0466
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefullbright.com
Party name: DNA Saves
 
Matthew S. Hellman Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Ave., N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
mhellman@jenner.com
Party name: Council for Responsible Genetics
 
William M. Jay Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4000
901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
wjay@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
 
Neal Kumar Katyal Hogan Lovells US LLP(202) 637-5528
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
Party name: Maryland Crime Victims' Resource Center, Inc., et al.
 
Prashant Kumar Khetan Troutman Sanders LLP(202) 274-2950
401 9th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
prashant.khetan@troutmansanders.com
Party name: National Governors Association, et al.
 
Karen J. Kruger Funk & Bolton, P.A.(410) 659-7700
Twelfth Floor, 36 South Charles Street
Baltimore, MD  21222
kkruger@fblaw.com
Party name: Maryland Chiefs of Police Association, Inc., et al.
 
Sandra K. Levick Public Defender Service for District of Columbia(202) 628-1200
633 Indiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20004
slevick@pdsdc.org
Party name: Public Defenders Service for the District of Columbia
 
Albert C. Locher National District Attorneys Assn.(703) 549-9222
44 Canal Center Plaza, Suite 110
Alexandria, VA  22314
lochera@sacda.org
Party name: National District Attorneys Association
 
Jennifer Lynch Electronic Frontier Foundation(415)-436-9333
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA  94109
jlynch@eff.org
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
 
Eric D. Miller Perkins Coie LLP(206)-359-3773
1201 Third Avenue Suite 4900
Seattle, WA  98101
EMiller@perkinscoie.com
Party name: Veterans for Common Sense
 
Erin Elizabeth Murphy NYU School of Law(212) 998-6672
40 Washington Sqyare South
New York, NY  10012
erin.murphy@nyu.edu
Party name: 14 Scholars of Forensic Evidence
 
Theodore B. Olson Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
tolson@gibsondunn.com
Party name: Global Alliance for Rapid DNA Testing
 
Michael T. Risher 39 Drumm St.(415)-293-6373
San Fransico, CA  94111
mrisher@aclunc.org
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
 
Marc Rotenberg Electronic Privacy Information Center(202) 483-1140
1718 Connecticut Ave., N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC  20009
rotenberg@epic.org
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center and twenty-six technical experts and legal scholars
 
William C. Sammons Tydings & Rosenberg LLP(410) 752-9700
100 East Pratt Street
26th Floor
Baltimore, MD  21202
wsammons@tydingslaw.com
Party name: Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault
 
Roberta T. Schwartz Deputy District Attorney(213) 974-1616
LA County DA's Office
320 W. Temple Street, Suite 540
Los Angeles, CA  90012
Party name: Los Angeles County District Attorney on behalf of Los Angeles County
 
Clifford M. Sloan 1440 New York Avenue, NW (202) 371-7040
Suite 800
Washington, DC  20005-2107
cliff.sloan@skadden.com
Party name: Maryland Legislators
 
Danielle Spinelli Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20006
danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Genetic scientists Robert Nussbaum and Sara H. Katsanis
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States