No. 12-1457 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | June 17, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-2063) |
Decision Date: | February 4, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 15, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 13 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2013) |
Jun 21 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2013. |
Aug 16 2013 | Brief of respondents Silverstrand Investments, et al. in opposition filed. |
Aug 29 2013 | Reply of petitioners AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al. filed. |
Sep 4 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
John C. Dwyer | Cooley LLP | (650) 843-5000 |
Counsel of Record | Five Palo Alto Square | |
4th Floor | ||
3000 El Camino Real | ||
Palo Alto, CA 94306-2155 | ||
dwyerjc@cooley.com | ||
Party name: AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Mitchell M.Z. Twersky | Abraham Fruchter & Twersky, LLP | (212) 279-5050 |
Counsel of Record | One Penn Plaza, Suite 2805 | |
New York, NY 10119 | ||
mtwersky@aftlaw.com | ||
Party name: Silverstrand Investments, et al. |