No. 12-1403 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 30, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-16781) |
Decision Date: | October 21, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 26, 2013 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | October 28, 2008 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 28 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2013) |
Jun 27 2013 | Waiver of right of respondents Business Men's Assurance Company of America, et al. to respond filed. |
Jul 2 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Jul 15 2013 | Response Requested . (Due August 14, 2013) |
Jul 23 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 27, 2013. |
Sep 27 2013 | Brief of respondents Business Men's Assurance Company of America, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 15 2013 | Reply of petitioner Beatriz Martinez-Claib filed. |
Oct 16 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 1, 2013. |
Nov 4 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Richard Johnston | 131A Stony Circle Suite 500 | (707)-939-5299 |
Santa Rosa, CA 95401 | ||
RichardJohnstonEsq@gmail.com | ||
Party name: Beatriz Martinez-Claib | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Kelly Jean Howard Garcia | Akerman Senterfitt | (407)-419-8455 |
Counsel of Record | Akerman Senterfitt | |
420 South Orange Ave. | ||
Suite 1200 | ||
Orlando, FL 32801 | ||
kelly.garcia@akerman.com | ||
Party name: Business Men's Assurance Company of America, et al. |