~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 24 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2013) |
Jun 24 2013 |
Waiver of right of respondents Caesars Entertainment Corporation, dba Harrah's Casino, et al. to respond filed. |
Jul 2 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Jul 17 2013 |
Response Requested . (Due August 16, 2013) |
Aug 2 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 27, 2013. |
Aug 27 2013 |
Brief of respondent Caesars Entertainment Corporation, dba Harrah's Casino, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 11 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Sep 11 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Debra Simmons-Myer filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 7 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |