No. 12-1392 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | May 29, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (A134619) |
Decision Date: | November 15, 2012 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | February 27, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 24 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 28, 2013) |
May 31 2013 | Waiver of right of respondents Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Jun 26 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Stephen D. Schear | 2831 Telegraph Avenue | (510)-832-3500 |
Counsel of Record | Oakland, CA 94609 | |
steveschear@gmail.com | ||
Party name: Hamid Safari | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Mark Anthony Kadzielski | Pepper Hamilton LLP | (213) 928-9820 |
Counsel of Record | 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3400 | |
Two California Plaza | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90071-3472 | ||
kadzielskim@pepperlaw.com | ||
Party name: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., et al. |