No. 12-137 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 31, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-5292) |
Decision Date: | January 27, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 3, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 30 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 30, 2012) |
Aug 24 2012 | Waiver of right of respondents Barack Husain Obama, President, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 29 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012. |
Oct 1 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Thomas P Sullivan | Jenner & Block LLP | (312) 222-9350 |
353 N. Clark Street | ||
Chicago, IL 60654 | ||
Party name: Abdulrahman Abdou Abou Al Ghaith Suleiman | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Barack Husain Obama, President , et al. |